THE KENT BRANCH OF THE CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CPRE Kent, the countryside charity, exists to promote the beauty, tranquillity and diversity of rural England by encouraging the sustainable use of land and other natural resources in town and country.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
- Medway
Governance
- 14 May 2002: Standard registration
- CPRE KENT (Working name)
- PROTECT KENT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rt Hon Damian Howard Green | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
MANUELO LUIGI LORENZO | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
BENEDICT ROBERT KIRKWIN MOORHEAD DL | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Horner | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Iris Loseby | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Evelyn Cary Drury | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Buckley | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Nigel Britten | Trustee | 26 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL MOORE | Trustee | 20 November 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244.45k | £180.79k | £193.12k | £201.25k | £252.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £251.54k | £273.85k | £312.05k | £290.09k | £317.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 6TH DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21ST NOVEMBER 2003 AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION 18 NOVEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE BRANCH IS ESTABLISHED (THE "OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE IMPROVEMENT AND PROTECTION OF THE ENGLISH COUNTRYSIDE AND IN PARTICULAR THAT OF KENT AND ITS TOWNS AND VILLAGES AND THE BETTER DEVELOPMENT OF THE RURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
QUEENS HEAD HOUSE
ASHFORD ROAD
CHARING
ASHFORD
KENT
TN27 0AD
- Phone:
- 01233714540
- Email:
- info@cprekent.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window