ST ALBANS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1092932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance education and training, by the provision and conduct, in or near St Albans of a day school for boys and also for girls in the sixth form.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 April 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Neil Frank Osborn Chair 15 September 2021
None on record
Guy Rory Sanderson Trustee 13 March 2025
None on record
Benjamin Charles Walker Trustee 04 September 2023
None on record
Cheryl Joanne Millington Trustee 03 March 2022
None on record
Frances Elizabeth Lightowler Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Christopher Miles Oglethorpe Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Anna Philpott Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Carole Pomfret MA ACA Trustee 12 May 2018
THE PEOPLE'S DISPENSARY FOR SICK ANIMALS
Received: On time
Matthew William Southworth Cawthorne Trustee 12 May 2018
None on record
Nigel Moore Trustee 03 March 2018
THE FRIENDS OF ST. FRANCIS CHURCH (1994)
Received: On time
Prof John Luzio Trustee 17 October 2015
None on record
ALASTAIR WOODGATE Trustee
THE ST ALBANS SCHOOL DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £19.11m £17.94m £18.39m £19.05m £21.64m
Total expenditure £16.30m £16.26m £16.24m £17.92m £20.20m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.78m £850.00k £751.00k £499.00k £331.00k
Income - Other trading activities £442.00k £376.00k £258.00k £366.00k £452.00k
Income - Charitable activities £16.81m £16.37m £17.25m £18.13m £20.64m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £75.00k £58.00k £60.00k £56.00k £217.00k
Income - Other £0 £285.00k £76.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £12.70k £619.54k £310.91k £214.93k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £15.00m £14.85m £14.93m £16.47m £18.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.30m £1.41m £1.30m £1.45m £1.52m
Expenditure - Governance £32.00k £26.00k £101.00k £64.00k £39.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £28.00k £29.00k £29.00k £29.00k £25.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £16.65m £18.81m £19.57m £19.35m £19.15m
Long-term investments £9.20m £9.13m £9.34m £9.13m £9.02m
Other assets £6.79m £4.31m £5.30m £5.85m £7.34m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£194.00k -£134.00k -£99.00k -£15.00k £0
Total liabilities £9.00m £7.03m £6.64m £5.88m £5.73m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 03 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 03 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 15 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 15 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 24 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 24 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 29 JANUARY 1973 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 2 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY A UNITING DIRECTION (MADE UNDER S96 (5) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993) AND DATED 12 MARCH 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A PRIZE OR PRIZES ANNUALLY TO BE AWARDED TO SUCH PUPIL OR PUPILS AS THE HEADMASTER CONSIDERS DESERVING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Registration history
  • 29 April 2004 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
ABBEY GATEWAY
ST. ALBANS
HERTFORDSHIRE
AL3 4HB
Phone:
01727515149