THE ROYAL MONMOUTHSHIRE ROYAL ENGINEERS (MILITIA) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the wider activities of the Regiment known as The Royal Monmouthshire Royal Engineers (Milita). Assisting with recruiting, retention and welfare of serving and formerly serving volunteers and their families. Ownership of Regimental Silver and chattels, also Regimental War Memorial at Monmouth. Assistance to Regimental Museum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 July 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Captain David Bell | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
MAJOR JEREMY WILLIAM GRANVILLE SMITH TD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
LIEUTENANT COLONEL DAVID WASHINGTON TD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Lieutenant Colonel Andrew Simon Tuggey CBE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
COLONEL IAN CHRISTOPHER THOMPSON TD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.22k | £8.93k | £2.27k | £2.41k | £4.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.35k | £8.49k | £6.25k | £2.60k | £835 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26 JUNE 2002
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE REGIMENT KNOWN AS THE ROYAL MONMOUTHSHIRE ROYAL ENGINEERS (MILITIA) ("THE REGIMENT") IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1.1. ENCOURAGING AND PROMOTING SUCH SPORTING ACTIVITIES AS SHALL BE CONDUCIVE TO MILITARY EFFICIENCY 1.2. PROMOTING AND MAINTAINING THE ESPRIT DE CORPS OF THE REGIMENT 1.3. UPHOLDING THE TRADITIONS OF THE REGIMENT 1.4. HOLDING RESTORING REPAIRING RECONSTRUCTING AND PRESERVING ITEMS IN THE REGIMENT'S COLLECTION AND SUPPORTING THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE ROYAL MONMOUTHSHIRE ROYAL ENGINEERS (MILITIA) REGIMENTAL MUSEUM (REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 274596) 1.5. EDUCATING MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT REGARDING ITS HISTORY AND MILITARY ACCOMPLISHMENTS 1.6. RELIEVING SICKNESS AMONGST PERSONS SERVING OR HAVING SERVED IN THE REGIMENT IN PARTICULAR BY MAKING DONATIONS TO HOSPITALS HOMES OR INSTITUTIONS HAVING AMONGST THEIR OBJECTS THE SUCCOUR IN SICKNESS OR CONVALESCENCE OF OFFICERS OR MEN WHO ARE SERVING OR HAVE SERVED IN HER MAJESTY'S FORCES 2. EDUCATING THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE HISTORY AND MILITARY ACCOMPLISHMENTS OF THE REGIMENT AND ENCOURAGING RECRUITMENT TO THE REGIMENT 3. RELIEVING NEED AMONGST PERSONS SERVING OR HAVING SERVED IN THE REGIMENT AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
R Mon RE (M) Charitable Trust
Regimental HQ
The Castle
MONMOUTH
Gwent
NP25 3BS
- Phone:
- 07803 403138
- Email:
- i.c.thompson@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window