VOLUNTARY SECTOR TRAINING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Through its activities, the charity seeks to make available high quality, low-cost, relevant training at accessible venues, from which the voluntary sector would not otherwise have been able to benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Total income includes £76,749 from government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 04 February 2003: Standard registration
- 27 October 2018: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 27 October 2018: Funds transferred to 1092567 COMMUNITY360
- VOLUNTARY SECTOR TRAINING (Working name)
- ESSEX CVS PARTNERSHIP VOLUNTARY SECTOR TRAINING (Previous name)
- NW ESSEX CVS PARTNERSHIP VOLUNTARY SECTOR TRAINING (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.41k | £195.71k | £172.69k | £134.22k | £150.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.39k | £166.04k | £172.90k | £167.57k | £147.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £76.75k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.79k | £6.00k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 28 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 28 February 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 13 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | 24 February 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 19 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | 19 January 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 9 DECEMBER 2002, 3 MARCH 2005 AND 24 JANUARY 2011. CERTIFICATES OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 3 JANUARY 2003, 21 MARCH 2005 AND 4 FEBRUARY 2011
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND EDUCATION TO THOSE WORKING (OR VOLUNTEERING) IN THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR IN ESSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS; THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR IS DEFINED FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION AS: A. INSTITUTIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES; B. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS CARRYING OUT CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
ESSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window