SMILE MEDIATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Smile Mediation Ltd (formerly known as Specialist Mediation in Lancashire East (SMILE) Ltd) provides community, family (non legal matters) & workplace mediation, restorative approaches, conflict coaching, group facilitation, training and workshops in communities across the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £40,461 from 10 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 May 2002: Standard registration
- SPECIALIST MEDIATION IN LANCASHIRE EAST (SMILE) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alex Wrigley | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian James Clark | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Swift | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Dobson | Trustee | 21 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Carol Jane Pike | Trustee | 12 December 2012 |
|
|||||
Peter Kenyon | Trustee | 22 December 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.61k | £102.95k | £132.54k | £94.65k | £130.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.35k | £80.18k | £110.21k | £148.70k | £119.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £35.00k | £23.41k | £40.13k | N/A | £40.46k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/11/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/07/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/07/2013 as amended on 04 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
“The Company is restricted to the following objects for the benefit of the public in the United Kingdom: (a) To facilitate the administration of the law by the promotion of arbitration, mediation and conciliation services to settle civil disputes. (b) To promote the preservation of public order through the provision of services for mediation and conciliation between people, organisations and groups who are involved in disputes or interpersonal conflicts. (c) To promote the preservation of public order through the provision of services for mediation and conciliation between victims of crime and offenders and for the preservation and protection of the well-being of such victims and the rehabilitation of such offenders. (d) To promote the protection of people and property from, and the prevention of, criminal acts in partnership with the police. (e) To advance the education of the public in the causes and effects of disputes and the skills of mediation, conflict prevention, management and resolution through the development of community initiatives and training and by such other means as the board of trustees may from time to time decide. (f) To develop the capacity and skills of people who are members of socially disadvantaged communities through the provision of community initiatives relating to mediation, conflict prevention, management and resolution such that they are better able to identify, and help meet, their needs and to participate more fully in society.”
Area of benefit
BURNLEY, PENDLE, ROSSENDALE, HYNDBURN, RIBBLE VALLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Smile Mediation Ltd
Room 21
62 - 64 Yorkshire Street
BURNLEY
Lancashire
BB11 3BT
- Phone:
- 01282436989
- Email:
- info@smile-ltd.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window