G F B HAMILTON SETTLEMENT
Charity number: 1095363
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity does not undertake activites to raise funds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2020
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 13 January 2003: Standard registration
- 04 May 2021: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 04 May 2021: Funds transferred to 1142553 THE QUEEN'S COLLEGE, OXFORD
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.03k | £19.61k | £146 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.57k | £11.30k | £7.57k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 April 2021 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 28 April 2021 | 448 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 28 April 2021 | 813 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 05 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 24 MARCH 1971
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE ENGLAND
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window