KIDDERMINSTER HARRIERS FC FOOTBALL IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to further and assist in the education of children both on a social and physical basis through the use of the game of football, including its history and rules. Other sports activities may also be used as educational tools in furtherance of the objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 10 July 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Jordan | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Phillip Knowlton | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Hart | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|||||
JOHN DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAY BROOKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ANDREW SEDDON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.74k | £67.09k | £147.88k | £184.22k | £190.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.82k | £68.35k | £97.29k | £145.75k | £175.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 JULY 2001
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER AND ASSIST IN THE EDUCATION (ON A SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL BASIS) OF CHILDREN ATTENDING SCHOOLS WITHIN THE WORCESTERSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS THROUGH THE USE OF THE GAME OF FOOTBALL (INCLUDING ITS HISTORY AND RULES) AND OTHER ANCILLARY SPORTING ACTIVITIES AS EDUCATIONAL TOOLS AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT TO PROVIDE IN WORCESTERSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA FACILITIES AT KIDDERMINSTER HARRIERS' FOOTBALL GROUND FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
WORCESTERSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kidderminster Harriers Football
Club
Aggborough Stadium
Hoo Road
KIDDERMINSTER
DY10 1NB
- Phone:
- 01562863821
- Email:
- harrierscommunity@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window