THE W.H. KNOX ASSOCIATED CHARITABLE TRUSTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of housing accommodation for persons who are in need, hardship or distress who profess a faith in accordance with the Statement of Faith and with a preference for those who are members of South Park Chapel The furtherance of the religious and other charitable work of South Park Chapel The maintenance of Christian missionaries
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Redbridge
Governance
- 22 May 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cornelia Antje Klazina Ferraby | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
Susie Margo Brant | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|||||||
Gregory Demosthenous | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|||||||
KATHERINE HEATHER JOY ERULIN | Trustee | 05 October 2011 |
|
|||||||
Jason Freeman | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.51k | £143.21k | £145.16k | £157.06k | £152.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £202.05k | £129.73k | £139.57k | £135.29k | £136.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 22ND JANUARY 2002
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE : (A) THE FURTHERANCE OF THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHAPEL; (B) THE PROVISION OF PLACES OF WORSHIP OR MEETING HALLS GOVERNED BY THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHAPEL OR THE PRACTICE OF THE OPEN BRETHREN; (C ) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS WHO PROFESS A FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH AND WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE WHO ARE MEMBERS (THE BENEFICIARIES); (D) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO PROFESS A FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH AND WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE WHO ARE MEMBERS. THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE SUCH PERSONS IN NEED BY: (1) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; (11) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; (111) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED; (E) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE; AND (F) MAINTENANCE OF CHRISTIAN MISSIONARIES ENGAGED WHOLLY OR PARTIALLY IN THE FOREIGN FIELD, OR OF RETIRED MISSIONARIES WHO ARE IN ILL HEALTH OR IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 SOUTH PARK TERRACE
ILFORD
IG1 1YA
- Phone:
- 02089119638
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window