Trustees SOUTH BUCKS JEWISH COMMUNITY
Charity Number: 1098078

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerard Raphael Geneen | Chair | 23 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Mason | Trustee | 23 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ekaterina Mehta | Trustee | 23 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Ralph Samuels | Trustee | 15 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Moira Gainsley | Trustee | 12 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lara-Jane Dennis | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Nickson | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL NATHAN | Trustee | 28 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Amanda McFeeters | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER DAVID SILVERSTONE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.