Financial history CURE LEUKAEMIA

Charity number: 1100154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £2.23m £329.01k £2.28m £2.68m £2.88m
Total expenditure £2.62m £508.95k £2.30m £2.35m £3.02m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £289.24k N/A £105.74k £267.93k £73.57k
Income - Other trading activities £1.82m N/A £1.87m £2.17m £2.63m
Income - Charitable activities £110.00k N/A £279.50k £230.50k £160.00k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.01k N/A £9.57k £8.81k £18.10k
Income - Other £0 N/A £14.26k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.00k N/A £0 £182.33k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.44m N/A £813.68k £677.85k £1.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.18m N/A £1.48m £1.67m £2.00m
Expenditure - Governance £15.06k N/A £160.72k £38.14k £55.85k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.09m N/A £652.96k £478.83k £786.78k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £6.21k £5.60k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0