Trustees CURE LEUKAEMIA
Charity number: 1100154

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Priyanka Mehta | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Margaret Hope | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alston Owens | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Mark Whitehead | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Claire Murphy | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Manning Shoaf CBE | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey William Cousins | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR Guy Edward Dickens Pratt | Trustee | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Turnbull | Trustee | 29 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CHARLES FRANK CRADDOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.