Financial history CRABTREE CHURCH TRUST

Charity Number: 1092748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £58.87k £85.70k £83.30k £64.31k £67.36k
Total expenditure £75.64k £81.53k £86.61k £84.29k £89.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A