BICESTER UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Learning cooperative of older people which enables members to share many educational creative and leisure activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
314 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 25 November 2002: Standard registration
- BICESTER U3A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather June Hall | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Krzysztof Jacek Kazmierczak | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christobel Wendy Smith | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Hawkins | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Garth Perkins | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Frydland | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helena Tuckwell | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony LOCK | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Ann DAY | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janice LAKER | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
David JONES | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tomas DUBY | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.32k | £5.87k | £14.78k | £13.18k | £16.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.21k | £6.47k | £14.85k | £12.07k | £16.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 29 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEP 2002 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 27 JAN 2022 as amended on 25 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECT (‘THE OBJECT’) IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN BICESTER AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
BICESTER AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Oxlip Leyes
BICESTER
Oxfordshire
OX26 3ED
- Phone:
- 01869932141
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window