LANDGUARD CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
There has not been any significant changes within the Trust during the financial year. We continue to run as per our constitution and maintain a good membership base. We are proud to be part of the Landguard Partnership which is striving to make the Felixstowe Peninsula a diverse place to visit with increasing public facilities being made available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Suffolk
Governance
- 18 November 2002: Standard registration
- LANDGUARD BIRD OBSERVATORY (Working name)
- LANGUARD CONSERVATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID PEARSONS | Chair |
|
||||||
William Brame | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ERIC PATRICK | Trustee | 05 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM MACKIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUSTIN ZANTBOER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MIKE MARSH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NIGEL ODIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.40k | £7.67k | £9.95k | £11.18k | £12.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.77k | £10.53k | £9.23k | £12.08k | £12.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £4.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 APRIL 2002 AS AMENDED 9TH OCTOBER 2002 AND AMENDED 14 MAY 2010.
Charitable objects
THE TRUST'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AT LANGUARD POINT, SUFFOLK AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ORNITHOLOGY, FLORA AND FAUNA, ECOLOGY, CONSERVATION, HISTORY AND OTHER MATTERS RELATING TO THE AREA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL AND STUDY FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
SUFFOLK - FELIXSTONE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Languard Bird Observatory
View Point Road
FELIXSTOWE
Suffolk
IP11 3TW
- Phone:
- 01394 834696
- Email:
- landguardbo@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window