THE CROSSKEYS MASONIC CHARITY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust objects is the support of charities by gifts and subscriptions in the masonic province of Gloucestertshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 11 August 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 04 September 2002: Standard registration
- 23 January 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 23 January 2024: Funds transferred to 1201163 THE MERCERS HALL GLOUCESTER
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 11/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.01k | £60.08k | £44.60k | £22.57k | £22.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.11k | £45.61k | £18.91k | £9.08k | £9.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 11 August 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 13 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2019
(These accounts |
13 November 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 MARCH 2002
Charitable objects
THE SUPPORT OF THE CHARITIES BY GIFTS AND SUBSCRIPTIONS TO BE PAID TO THE TRUSTEES BY MEMBERS OF THE LODGE OR BY ANY SUBSCRIBING MEMBER OF ANY MASONIC LODGE MEETING IN THE MASONIC PROVINCE OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND TO THIS END THE TRUSTEES MAY ACQUIRE PERSONAL PROPERTY OF ANY NATURE AND SHALL APPLY THE SAME AND THE INCOME THEREOF FOR OR TOWARDS ALL OR ANY OF THE PURPOSES HEREINAFTER MENTIONED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHARITIES AS FOLLOWS:- A) IN MAKING DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS OR LOANS TO THE CHARITIES EITHER DIRECTLY OR THROUGH THE LODGE'S CHARITY ACCOUNT B)GENERALLY IN THE UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES PROVIDING FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND FURTHERANCE OF THE INTERESTS OF THE CHARITIES C) DOING ALL SUCH THINGS AS MAY IN LAW BE CHARITABLE AS ARE NECESSARY FOR THE PURPOSES AFORESAID OR ANY OF THEM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CROSS KEYS LANE IN GLOUCESTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window