THE SHOW CRIB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To offer a supportive environment for young people parents/carers dealing with youth related issues, e.g. school exclusions and gang activity. Workshops as follows:Trading Places police young people, knife awareness, Bullying, Relationship, Baby me not, Consequences. Summer programs, Family support Health, Education, Employment, College,welfare, benefits, counselling, health, drug advice
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £56,549 from 4 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Barking And Dagenham
- Brent
- Camden
- Enfield
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
- Redbridge
- Tower Hamlets
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 01 September 2003: Standard registration
- THE CRIB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Franklyn Sweeney | Chair | 14 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Emeka Egbuonu | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Austin | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Uma Divekar | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Samuel | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Shoyemi | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cara Phillips | Trustee | 14 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £167.03k | £141.23k | £171.14k | £163.20k | £102.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £176.55k | £164.59k | £215.42k | £138.64k | £126.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £102.66k | £43.65k | £70.55k | £61.98k | £56.55k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 JUNE 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 NOVEMBER 2002 AND 6 AUGUST 2003
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN NEED IN CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO ASSIST THEM IN DEVELOPING THEIR MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MIGHT GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 BALMES ROAD
1-16 BENYON COURT
DEBEAUVIOUR ESTATE
LONDON
N15TJ
- Phone:
- 02072544732
- Email:
- manager@thecrib.biz
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window