Financial history WORTH ABBEY

Charity Number: 1093913
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £16.31m £15.53m £18.98m £21.87m £23.49m
Total expenditure £15.95m £15.72m £17.97m £21.75m £23.41m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £36.58k £257.21k £138.05k £170.08k £256.81k
Income - Donations and legacies £283.96k £337.77k £394.82k £246.41k £291.80k
Income - Other trading activities £155.58k £115.65k £414.79k £708.23k £672.18k
Income - Charitable activities £14.92m £14.62m £17.48m £19.93m £21.65m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £189.52k £128.58k £109.20k £220.57k £301.85k
Income - Other £764.44k £323.75k £574.68k £767.00k £564.92k
Income - Legacies £0 £2.00k £5.10k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £15.70m £15.12m £16.97m £20.51m £22.26m
Expenditure - Raising funds £242.38k £596.58k £1.00m £1.23m £1.15m
Expenditure - Governance £443.94k £27.75k £38.13k £42.68k £42.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £287.46k £319.47k
Expenditure - Investment management £34.83k £34.23k £27.16k £9.43k £13.93k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0