LONDON MACCABI RECREATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing quality sports and recreational facilities for all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 December 2002: Standard registration
- ROWLEY LANE SPORTS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- ROWLEY LANE MACCABI RECREATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
- ROWLEY LANE RECREATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Phillips | Trustee | 06 February 2014 |
|
|||||||||
JOEL NATHAN | Trustee | 03 January 2013 |
|
|||||||||
David Kyte | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £128 | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.30k | £29.97k | £29.81k | £22.91k | £22.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 May 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 18 JULY, 2002, AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATES OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGES OF NAME DATED 13TH JUNE 2006 AND 3RD JUNE 2008.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF LONDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, IN PARTICULAR BY ASSISTING WITH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR INDOOR AND OUTDOOR GAMES AND ATHLETICS. (PLEASE SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION FOR FURTHER DETAILS)
Area of benefit
LONDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
LONDON MACCABI RECREATIONAL TRUST
ROWLEY LANE SPORTS GROUND
ROWLEY LANE
ARKLEY, HERTS
EN5 3HW
- Phone:
- 02084416051
- Email:
- lisa@maccabilondon.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window