Financial history FENLAND AREA COMMUNITY ENTERPRISE TRUST

Charity number: 1097098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £913.16k £918.78k £903.61k £1.04m £1.15m
Total expenditure £869.04k £835.03k £798.45k £907.10k £1.00m
Income from government contracts £623.55k £570.43k £677.56k £832.20k £916.10k
Income from government grants £30.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £14.20k £8.50k £9.64k £22.60k £85.55k
Income - Other trading activities £116.41k £76.31k £131.40k £142.62k £144.67k
Income - Charitable activities £780.89k £832.86k £761.63k £869.17k £916.10k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.67k £1.11k £948 £2.69k £3.49k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £544 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £816.52k £806.62k £774.39k £888.50k £977.52k
Expenditure - Raising funds £52.52k £28.41k £24.06k £18.60k £23.94k
Expenditure - Governance £3.90k £0 £5.40k £5.85k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0