THE CROWNS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christians reaching out to West Norfolk schools. During the past year the 3 part-time workers and a number of volunteers went into over 60 local primary schools and 6 secondary schools, taking part in numerous acts of collective worship and RE lessons. We were also privileged to to host GSUS Live and the Life Exhibition, a number of holiday clubs and church weekends were also undertaken.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
- 02 July 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maynard John Archer | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rev Alexander James Munro | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
ANNE SPARROW | Trustee | 12 January 2015 |
|
|||||||
ALAN CRAWSHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
RICHARD WILLIAM PENNINGTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.90k | £3.80k | £4.29k | £3.62k | £3.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.76k | £3.40k | £4.13k | £1.80k | £1.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 08 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 05 April 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SCHOOLS IN THE WEST NORFOLK AREA IN PARTICULAR BY TAKING PART IN ACTS OF COLLECTIVE WORSHIP AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION LESSONS.
Area of benefit
WEST NORFOLK AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 SAXON WAY
DERSINGHAM
KING'S LYNN
PE31 6LY
- Phone:
- 07989211839
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window