ECHO for Extra Choices in Herefordshire Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ECHO provides activities and support for disabled people in Herefordshire. Most activities are suitable for people with moderate or severe learning difficulties, but we try to support anyone who wishes to take part in our activities, including people with mental health problems and people with physical or sensory disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£890,755
Donations and legacies | £83.51k | |
Charitable activities | £746.67k | |
Other trading activities | £47.93k | |
Investments | £12.63k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£968,731
Raising funds | £68.96k | |
Charitable activities | £899.77k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £68.96k | |
Charitable expenditure | £899.77k |
People

54 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
114 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Herefordshire
Governance
- ECHO (Working name)
- ECHO FOR EXTRA CHOICES IN HEREFORDSHIRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joy House | Chair | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Scott | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Clare Cathcart | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Haines | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jeremy Gray | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Jones | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Bradford | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Arthur | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Hamblin | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
JASON STUCHBERY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BLAISE ALEXANDER WHITE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £758.60k | £920.94k | £811.44k | £1.25m | £890.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £811.04k | £787.03k | £861.74k | £940.00k | £968.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £78.20k | £24.15k | £18.66k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £58.13k | £108.89k | £47.37k | £412.94k | £83.51k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £53.85k | £14.23k | £37.50k | £56.03k | £47.93k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £643.87k | £793.50k | £724.06k | £774.91k | £746.67k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.75k | £4.33k | £2.51k | £3.90k | £12.63k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £353.38k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £790.08k | £748.19k | £788.56k | £887.06k | £899.77k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £20.96k | £38.84k | £73.18k | £52.94k | £68.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.56k | £11.78k | £12.25k | £309.91k | £243.71k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.80k | £3.00k | £1.20k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £314.52k | £452.74k | £407.23k | £719.49k | £629.87k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £30.09k | £32.58k | £35.58k | £38.85k | £27.21k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 12 JUNE 2002 AMENDED ON 5 JANUARY 2007 AND 3 JULY 2008 as amended on 10 Dec 2021 as amended on 10 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE COUNTY OF HEREFORDSHIRE AND THE IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY: I) ENABLING ADULTS WITH LEARNING OR PHYSICAL DISABILITIES OR MENTAL HEALTH DIFFICULTIES TO ATTEND ORDINARY EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES. II) ORGANISING SPECIAL MIXED ABILITY COURSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF ADULTS WITH LEARNING OR PHYSICAL DISABILITIES OR MENTAL HEALTH DIFFICULTIES III) ORGANISING SPECIALIST EDUCATIONAL OR TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF ADULTS WITH LEARNING OR PHYSICAL DISABILITIES OR MENTAL HEALTH DIFFICULTIES (C) TO SUPPORT ADULTS WITH LEARNING AND PHYSICAL DISABILITIES OR MENTAL HEALTH DIFFICULTIES TO ACCESS LEISURE, VOLUNTEERING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF THEIR LIVES AND INCREASING THEIR OPPORTUNITIES FOR INCLUSION IN THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
HEREFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 - 42 West Street
Leominster
Herefordshire
HR6 8ES
- Phone:
- 01568620307
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window