ST BRIDE'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1094307
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supports the liturgy, ministry, fabric and music of St Bride's Church, Fleet Street

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,704
Total expenditure: £282,007

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 January 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ST BRIDE'S APPEAL (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Graham Hill Trustee 23 April 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BRIDE FLEET STREET
Received: On time
THE GUILD OF ST BRIDE
Received: On time
ST BRIDE CHURCH ORGAN FUND TRUST
Received: On time
Lesley-Ann Jones Trustee 09 May 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BRIDE FLEET STREET
Received: On time
ST BRIDE CHURCH ORGAN FUND TRUST
Received: On time
Charles Alexander Garside Trustee 03 August 2020
None on record
Nicholas Baldock Trustee 31 May 2018
THE GUILD OF ST BRIDE
Received: On time
ST BRIDE CHURCH ORGAN FUND TRUST
Received: On time
Valerie Jean Locks Trustee 31 May 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BRIDE FLEET STREET
Received: On time
ST BRIDE CHURCH ORGAN FUND TRUST
Received: On time
REV Alison Jane Joyce Trustee 05 November 2016
ST BRIDE CHURCH ORGAN FUND TRUST
Received: On time
THE H J C STEVENS ORGAN SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
Lindsay Nicholson MBE Trustee 05 November 2016
THE CITY LITERARY INSTITUTE
Received: On time
VISCOUNT ROTHERMERE Trustee 05 November 2016
None on record
JAMES NIALL MANUS MACMANUS Trustee 05 November 2016
None on record
DAVID BRIAN MELVILLE CAVAYE Trustee 05 November 2016
None on record
PETER WILLIAM SILVER Trustee 05 November 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £43.29k £4.61k £3.24k £3.28k £4.70k
Total expenditure £205.17k £295.24k £275.85k £224.26k £282.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31 OCTOBER 1990
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROMOTION OF THE MINISTRY OF ST BRIDE'S CHURCH FLEET STREET FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT IN ANY WAY LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) ALL INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS CONNECTED WITH (A) THE COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY AND (B) THE SERVICE, FINANCIAL, LEGAL AND OTHER INDUSTRIES ESTABLISHED OR TO BE ESTABLISHED WITHIN THE PARISH OF ST BRIDE'S CHURCH FLEET STREET
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 10 January 1995 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
ST BRIDES
FLEET STREET
LONDON
EC4Y 8AU
Phone:
02074270133