Financial history THE CHRISTIAN MEDITATION TRUST (UK)

Charity number: 1101900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £47.24k £44.07k £9.28k £6.69k £6.56k
Total expenditure £58.59k £211.86k £8.67k £7.22k £6.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A