THE STRAWBERRY HILL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
180 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 24 January 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zoe Colbeck | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Thomas Nash | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Robert Waiting | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Finucane | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Baxter | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lynn Beard | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Xenia Carr-Griffiths | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Henry Sherman | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £813.60k | £496.83k | £662.94k | £806.50k | £639.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £832.78k | £534.92k | £618.45k | £903.19k | £812.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £200.90k | £245.60k | £116.26k | £10.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £229.81k | N/A | £339.42k | £415.93k | £35.68k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £126.84k | N/A | £104.04k | £111.03k | £84.19k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £456.82k | N/A | £219.47k | £279.54k | £278.24k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £73 | N/A | £2 | £2 | £168 | |
|
Income - Other | £62 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £60.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £11.73k | £77.14k | £8.45k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £713.07k | N/A | £554.03k | £836.38k | £700.28k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £54.20k | N/A | £12.32k | £14.25k | £27.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | £9.48k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £65.51k | N/A | £52.10k | £52.56k | £84.19k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £87.19k | N/A | £75.10k | £63.26k | £47.88k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £100 | |
|
Other assets | £575.61k | N/A | £666.50k | £561.41k | £365.93k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £90.52k | N/A | £118.19k | £136.57k | £94.83k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/08/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/02/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/02/2013 as amended on 07 Jun 2022 as amended on 07 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
4 Objects The charity's objects (Objects) are specifically restricted to the following: 4.1 the advancement of the education of the public and the advancement of the arts, culture and heritage by: 4.1.1 preserving for the public benefit Strawberry Hill House, its historical, architectural and artistic heritage, its collection of paintings, furniture and other objects and its garden (together "the House) and by providing public access to the House on appropriate terms; and 4.1.2 maintaining the House for the public benefit as a diverse cultural hub reflecting the enduring values of its creator, Horace Walpole, and his successors as owners, as an educational resource open to everyone and as a focus and venue for community activities of all kinds.
Area of benefit
TWICKENHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
268 Waldegrave Road
Strawberry Hill
Twickenham
TW1 4ST
- Phone:
- 02087441241
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window