UK ALEXANDER VON HUMBOLDT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual meeting with programme of speakers in sciences and arts. Irregular further meetings. Encouragement to young scholars to study in Germany. Help with German scholars visiting UK and funded by the Humboldt Foundation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 November 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Robert Vilain | Chair | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Gennady Mishuris | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Belen Olmos Giupponi | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paras Anand | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Justin Lamonte Tumlinson | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Timothy Michael Devinney | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shannon Anthony Bonke | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW LAURENCE ALDERSEY JOHNSON | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Ingo Dierking | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Feng Wang | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roy Ruddle | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||
John Baines | Trustee | 10 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Rainer Cramer | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR PEG KATRITZKY PHD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.13k | £80 | £0 | £1.23k | £1.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.52k | £0 | £0 | £1.09k | £309 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 209 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JUNE 1999 AS AMENDED 2 OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ACADEMICS LOCATED IN BRITAIN BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS OR OTHER CHARITABLE SUPPORT FOR THEIR ACADEMIC RESEARCH AND CO-OPERATION, PARTICULARLY THOSE WISHING TO STUDY IN THE FIELDS OF NATURAL AND SOCIAL SCIENCES AND HUMANITIES, AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAVENDISH LABORATORY
UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE
19 JJ THOMSON AVENUE
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 0HE
- Phone:
- 01223337380
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window