Trustees UK ALEXANDER VON HUMBOLDT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1100683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Robert Vilain Chair 16 September 2022
None on record
Prof. Gennady Mishuris Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Prof. Belen Olmos Giupponi Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Dr Paras Anand Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Prof. Justin Lamonte Tumlinson Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Prof. Timothy Michael Devinney Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Dr Shannon Anthony Bonke Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Dr ANDREW LAURENCE ALDERSEY JOHNSON Trustee 21 July 2022
DERBY CHAMBER MUSIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
Dr Ingo Dierking Trustee 21 March 2022
None on record
Dr Feng Wang Trustee 12 March 2022
None on record
Dr Roy Ruddle Trustee 01 October 2018
2ND OTLEY SCOUT GROUP
Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
John Baines Trustee 10 December 2017
None on record
Professor Rainer Cramer Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
DR PEG KATRITZKY PHD Trustee
None on record