Accounts and annual returns PROVIDING EX-OFFENDERS POSITIVE LEARNING ENVIRONMENTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1095676
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 July 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 October 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 July 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 July 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 October 2020 On Time