ONE EAST MIDLANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Communication and representation on behalf of the voluntary and community sector with key stakeholders. Secretariat services supporting key regional voluntary and community sector working groups, and regional research and other project work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Rutland
Governance
- 22 November 2002: Standard registration
- EAST MIDLANDS SINGLE PLATFORM (Previous name)
- ENGAGE EAST MIDLANDS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Craig | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Subash Chellaiah | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|||||
CHARLES SHAW | Trustee | 31 March 2016 |
|
|||||
PHILIP EDWARD LAKIN | Trustee | 25 June 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £822 | £2 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.75k | £2.05k | £661 | £607 | £408 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 3 OCTOBER 2007, 2 APRIL 2008 AND 9 SEPTEMBER 2009 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 9 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS OF THE EAST MIDLANDS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; (B) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENT APPLICATION OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND NON CHARITABLE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS WORKING FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN THE EAST MIDLANDS AREA.
Area of benefit
RESIDENTS OF THE EAST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
YDA Chambers
1A-2A Beaumont Fee
LINCOLN
LN1 1UU
- Phone:
- 01522 569776
- Email:
- office@one-em.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window