THE FIG TREE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the teaching and preaching of the Christian faith either in the United Kingdom or abroad.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 May 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRUCE DOUGLAS GARDINER | Chair |
|
||||||
GARRETT JOHN CASEY | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE LOUISE NEWMAN | Trustee | 22 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHAN WAI WONG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.75k | £1.88k | £1.88k | £9.69k | £625 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.33k | £3.00k | £15 | £7.59k | £6.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 NOVEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 4 APRIL 2003.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 LOWER DOWNS ROAD
LONDON
SW20 8QF
- Phone:
- 02084047609
- Email:
- john6.35@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window