LIVERPOOL CATHEDRAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Covering five broad areas of Cathedral life - Visitors, Music, Mission, Fabric and Precinct - our aim is to ensure that Liverpool Cathedral is fit for purpose for all of its visitors and fully equipped to serve its City and Diocese during its second century and beyond. Additionally, through new facilities, we aim to generate new income streams in a major step towards self-sufficiency.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 02 December 2002: Standard registration
- LIVERPOOL CATHEDRAL CENTENARY FUND (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH LOUISE GREENSMITH | Chair | 19 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
Jayne Lisa Hauxwell | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Alistair Graham Fletcher | Trustee | 19 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
Very Revd Dr Susan Helen Jones | Trustee | 16 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||
JAMES CHRISTOPHER MEREDITH DAVIES | Trustee | 15 March 2011 |
|
|
||||||
Corporation of Liverpool Cathedral | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Geoffrey Appleton | Trustee |
|
||||||||
WILLIAM DAVID FULTON JP DL FCA | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JOHN CRANE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.04k | £10.52k | £46.61k | £7.87k | £9.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.07k | £24.61k | £40.29k | £2.66k | £1.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15/07/2002 AS AMENDED ON 04/10/2010
Charitable objects
SUBJECT AS AFORESAID THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND TO APPLY THE CAPITAL AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") NAMELY THE FURTHERANCE OF THE RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE WORK OF THE ANGLICAN CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CHRIST IN LIVERPOOL AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THOSE OBJECTS BUT IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF THE TRUSTEES SHALL GIVE PRIORITY TO: . THE RE-POINTING OF THE STONEWORK OF LIVERPOOL CATHEDRAL . PROVIDING AN EDUCATION FACILITY AND NEW VISITOR CENTRE WITHIN LIVERPOOL CATHEDRAL . ESTABLISHING AN ENDOWMENT FOR A GIRLS' CHOIR . MODIFYING LIVERPOOL CATHEDRAL SO AS TO COMPLY WITH THE DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION ACT OF 1995 . SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE ADOPTED BY THE DEAN AND CHAPTER AS OBJECTS OF THE LIVERPOOL CATHEDRAL CENTENARY FUND.
Area of benefit
MERSEYDIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LIVERPOOL CATHEDRAL
ST. JAMES ROAD
LIVERPOOL
L1 7AZ
- Phone:
- 01517027244
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window