THE TIMBERSCOMBE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides assistance for the purposes of the charity in Timberscombe and adjacent parishes on Exmoor
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
- Somerset
Governance
- 27 March 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JOHN DENYS CHARLES ANSTICE PRIDEAUX CBE | Chair |
|
||||||
PHILIPPA MARY ANSTICE PRIDEAUX | Trustee |
|
||||||
STEPHEN ROBERT BERESFORD HUMPHREYS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.75k | £0 | £1.25k | £500 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.50k | £0 | £1.16k | £750 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 OCTOBER 2002
Charitable objects
ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF TIMBERSCOMBE IN THE COUNTY OF SOMERSET AND SUCH ADJOINING OR NEARBY PARISHES ON EXMOOR AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CROYDON HOUSE FARM
TIMBERSCOMBE
MINEHEAD
TA24 7TN
- Phone:
- 01643841327
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window