THE SOLDIERS OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Soldiers Of Gloucestershire Museum exists to collect, conserve & display objects relating to The Gloucestershire Regiment & The Royal Gloucestershire Hussars, for the benefit of the citizens of Gloucestershire, Bristol and the general public, in particular the collections are used in support of the national curriculum and furtherance of study of the military history of Gloucestershire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
- Gloucestershire
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 17 December 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GUY EDWARD CHRISTOPHER WOODCOCK | Chair |
|
||||||
Peter Roland Henry Clifford MBE TD | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Leonard Evans | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John Phillips | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Philip Laurance Cooper Crook TD,VR | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Dixon OBE | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ellie King | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Thomas Joseph Brooke | Trustee | 02 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy John Brain | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|||||
John Francis Penley OBE TD | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Anthony Hugh Ayres | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Drew Daniel MBE | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
AHMED SAID HANSDOT | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Randolf Mullings | Trustee | 31 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £208.69k | £203.37k | £193.13k | £92.71k | £280.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £281.80k | £223.23k | £173.66k | £168.03k | £142.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £82.70k | £13.63k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 9 JULY 2002, AMENDED 10 NOVEMBER 2010. as amended on 09 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MILITARY EFFICIENCY AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE REGIMENT, THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE HUSSARS, THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE REGIMENT AND THE RIFLES, OR THE IMMEDIATE OR ANY SUCCESSIVE LEGAL SUCCESSOR UNIT OR SUB-UNIT UNDER ANY ARMY ORDER, OR EQUIVALENT THEREOF, BY THE PROTECTION, PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE, RESTORATION AND EXHIBITION OF UNIFORMS, MEDALS, PICTURES, BOOKS, MANUSCRIPTS, MAPS, DOCUMENTS, EQUIPMENT, MACHINERY, APPARATUS, BUILDINGS, STRUCTURES AND ALL OTHER ITEMS OF MILITARIA.
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOLDIERS OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE MUSEUM
CUSTOM HOUSE
31 COMMERCIAL ROAD
GLOUCESTER
GL1 2HE
- Phone:
- 01452522682
- Email:
- vicki.hopson@sogm.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window