WINDSOR DEDWORTH MANOR TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity aims to advance the education of all women and to assist in the provision of facilities for leisure time occupations. To this end activities include talks, arts and crafts, rambling, social studies, outings lunches, flower arranging, quizzes and fund raising social activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 28 January 2003: Standard registration
- 15 March 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 15 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1108298 THAMES HOSPICE
- 15 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1118947 ALEXANDER DEVINE CHILDREN'S CANCER TRUST
- 15 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1136536 ELECTRIC EELS
- 15 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1177688 AGE CONCERN WINDSOR
- 15 March 2023: Funds transferred to 306072 TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILDS
- 15 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1083939 MAIDENHEAD COX GREEN TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD
- 15 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1092626 THE MAIDENHEAD HIGHWAY TOWNSWOMENS GUILD
- THE WINDSOR DEDWORTH MANOR TOWNWOMEN'S GUILD (Previous name)
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.63k | £3.20k | £4.53k | £1.61k | £637 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.32k | £3.79k | £2.93k | £1.87k | £552 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 01 December 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 01 December 2021 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MAY 2000 as amended on 28 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
A TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD IS FORMED FOR SUCH PURPOSES GENERALLY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND MORE SPECIFICALLY (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING):- 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF WOMEN IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE CREED AND PARTY SO AS TO ENABLE THEM TO MAKE THE BEST CONTRIBUTION TOWARDS THE COMMON GOOD. 2. TO EDUCATE SUCH WOMEN IN THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND IN ALL PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY CARRYING OUT RESEARCH INTO ANY PUBLIC QUESTIONS WHETHER LOCAL NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL, AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF ANY SUBJECT OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE WHERE WOMEN HAVE PARTICULAR KNOWLEDGE OR EXPERIENCE. 5. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR SUCH WOMEN IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. WINDSOR. DEDWORTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window