SFAC
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SFAC provides specialist assistance for children's projects that work with children in alternative care or in need of protection from harm. We work in partnership with local organisations to provide them with training, mentoring, coaching to turn good intentions into good practice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £14,352 from 6 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Australia
- Brazil
- Burma
- Ghana
- Haiti
- India
- Indonesia
- Iraq
- Kenya
- Lesotho
- Morocco
- Paraguay
- Philippines
- Romania
- Switzerland
- Thailand
- Turkey
- Uganda
- United States
Governance
- 17 December 2002: Standard registration
- 23 September 2022: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 23 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1186903 SFAC
- S.F.A.C. (Working name)
- STRENGTHENING FAMILIES FOR ABANDONED CHILDREN (Working name)
- SUBSTITUTE FAMILIES FOR ABANDONED CHILDREN (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.71k | £121.70k | £139.15k | £71.91k | £27.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.51k | £135.48k | £141.56k | £151.84k | £27.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | £26.90k | £14.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 AUG 2002 AS AMENDED ON 18 APR 2017
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP FOSTERING PROJECTS FOR ABANDONED CHILDREN IN BRAZIL AND OTHER DEVELOPING COUNTRIES; TO PROVIDE FAMILY AND CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES WITHIN LOCAL COMMUNITIES; FINANCIALLY ASSIST CHILDREN'S HOMES AND OLDER CHILDREN WITH EDUCATIONAL FEES AND/OR VOCATIONAL TRAINING; ANY OTHER ACTIVITY THAT IS CHARITABLE BY LAW THAT WOULD AID THE RELIEF OF HARDSHIP AND POVERTY TO CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window