Financial history HUNTINGDON ACTION COMMUNITY PROJECTS

Charity number: 1097615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £31.64k £52.06k £12.36k £39.01k £22.49k
Total expenditure £8.17k £20.84k £28.24k £33.16k £29.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.31k £36.42k £3.00k £17.45k £3.50k