LOUGHBOROUGH CHILD CONTACT CENTRE

Charity number: 1095703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Offers a safe, friendly and neutral environment where children of separated families can spend time with one or both parents and sometimes other family members.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £5,579
Total expenditure: £3,531

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 January 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev MICHAEL BROADLEY Chair 24 June 2015
THE HERRICK HOMES
Received: On time
Kerrie Fox Trustee 03 July 2024
None on record
Alison Attwell Trustee 03 July 2024
None on record
Michael Denby Smith Trustee 28 June 2020
None on record
ANDREW DUXBURY ACA Trustee 30 January 2003
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.85k £718 £4.19k £1.66k £5.58k
Total expenditure £2.77k £1.18k £2.19k £2.94k £3.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 29 December 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 14 January 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
72 LOWESWATER DRIVE
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE11 3RS
Phone:
07932195229