Financial history MANCHESTER ENVIRONMENTAL EDUCATION NETWORK

Charity number: 1095908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.84k £24.82k £21.79k £22.33k £22.42k
Total expenditure £26.94k £19.84k £25.20k £24.24k £25.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.15k £12.19k N/A N/A