Financial history THE CLUSTER CARE GROUP

Charity number: 1100948
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.40k £6.58k £8.20k £13.40k £8.72k
Total expenditure £12.92k £6.15k £12.07k £19.18k £17.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A