HOPE VALLEY CHRISTIAN YOUTH WORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This Association supports childrens and youth recreation activities in the Hope Valley area of Derbyshire,working within a Christian Ethos but open to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 16 February 2004: Standard registration
- HVCYW (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Stephen Robert Brennan | Chair | 25 March 2019 |
|
|||||||
Rev Jonathan Roger Wilson Brook | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|||||||
Rev Julie Ann LETTS | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|||||||
Rev Louise Ann Miranda Petheram | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Marjorie Boon | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
ROGER MATHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ELISABETH MADDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MRS LIZ WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.85k | £5.59k | £3.69k | £2.98k | £3.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.63k | £1.56k | £4.33k | £3.03k | £4.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED 19 JANUARY 2004 AND 13 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
WITHIN A CHRISTIAN ETHOS AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE RESIDENT IN HOPE VALLEY IN DERBYSHIRE: A. TO HELP AND EDUCATE THE SAID CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. B. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE SAID CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID BENEFICIARIES AND OTHER RESIDENTS OF HOPE VALLEY. C) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR CHRISTIAN WORSHIP AND LEARNING FOR THE SAID CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE SAID BENEFICIARIES AND OTHER RESIDENTS OF THE HOPE VALLEY.
Area of benefit
HOPE VALLEY IN DERBYSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLACKBERRY COTTAGE
MAIN ROAD
BAMFORD
HOPE VALLEY
S33 0AY
- Phone:
- 01433651795
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window