THE GRAIN HOUSE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Communicate the gospel of Jesus Christ by demonstrating His love within the community. Run numerous seminars & courses like Alpha for all those interested in the Christian faith that come to church & live in the local community. Relieve people in need & hardship, support parents, teenagers, children, the elderly & those with special needs through various church & community activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Total income:
£500,953
Donations and legacies | £383.81k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £116.56k | |
Investments | £580 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£410,052
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £339.63k | |
Other | £70.43k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £70.43k | |
Charitable expenditure | £339.63k | |
Retained for future use | £90.90k |
People

8 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
175 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 21 March 2003: Standard registration
- 07 April 2016: Funds received from 1137125 CHOICES ALTON
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Ellis | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham John Bland | Trustee | 17 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIAN MILLS | Trustee | 28 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Diarra | Trustee | 28 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Alan Haddow | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Andrew Lawrence | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £574.24k | £526.47k | £439.44k | £512.45k | £500.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £478.81k | £485.29k | £391.76k | £377.01k | £410.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £34.06k | £62.83k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £423.19k | £429.04k | N/A | £413.53k | £383.81k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £145.48k | £94.62k | N/A | £98.51k | £116.56k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.49k | £2.73k | N/A | £387 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £77 | £80 | N/A | £19 | £580 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £478.81k | £421.80k | N/A | £330.33k | £339.63k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £63.49k | N/A | £46.68k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.90k | £14.22k | N/A | £23.09k | £27.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £70.43k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.34m | £3.30m | N/A | £3.23m | £3.19m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £164.29k | £164.16k | N/A | £196.69k | £199.03k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £557.01k | £478.37k | N/A | £254.81k | £129.84k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 9 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 9 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 June 2022 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 June 2022 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/12/2013
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN ALTON HAMPSHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED "THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFILL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED , INFIRM OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; C) TO PROMOTE AND FULFILL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (INCLUDING THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION) BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN ALTON HAMPSHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
THE COMMUNITY IN ALTON HAMPSHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALTON MALTINGS CENTRE
MALTINGS CLOSE
ALTON
GU34 1DT
- Phone:
- 0142081950
- Email:
- ght@harvestchurchalton.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window