SHELTERBOX TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ShelterBox provides emergency shelter and vital supplies to support communities around the world overwhelmed by disaster and humanitarian crises.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£26,152,000
Donations and legacies | £25.07m | |
Charitable activities | £494.00k | |
Other trading activities | £164.00k | |
Investments | £423.00k | |
Other | £6.00k |
Total expenditure:
£23,064,000
Raising funds | £3.86m | |
Charitable activities | £19.21m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.86m | |
Charitable expenditure | £19.21m | |
Retained for future use | £3.09m |
People

140 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of London
- Cornwall
- Bangladesh
- Burkina Faso
- Cameroon
- Chad
- Ethiopia
- Lebanon
- Malawi
- Mozambique
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Philippines
- Somalia
- Syria
- Turkey
- Ukraine
- Yemen
Governance
- 12 March 2003: Standard registration
- 13 October 2020: Funds received from 1175307 NUNEATON COMMUNITY ENTERPRISE
- 02 August 2021: Funds received from 1036746 ROTARY CLUB OF WOODSTOCK & KIDLINGTON
- 23 August 2021: Funds received from 1071587 THE ROTARY CLUB OF COVENTRY BREAKFAST CHARITABLE T...
- 14 July 2023: Funds received from 1038565 ROTARY CLUB OF AMBLESIDE TRUST FUND
- 17 July 2023: Funds received from 278758 THE ROTARY CLUB OF MILL HILL TRUST
- 28 March 2024: Funds received from 1023206 THE KIMBLE-ARMSTRONG TRUST
- 30 July 2024: Funds received from 516725 ROTARY CLUB OF SOUTH HOLLAND TRUST FUND
- 17 September 2024: Funds received from 1060413 ROTARY CLUB OF SOUTHAM TRUST FUND
- 08 October 2024: Funds received from 501416 ROTARY CLUB OF HUDDERSFIELD TRUST FUND
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Srikaran Srivivekanandarajah | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Elizabeth Fox | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW CARTER | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
George William Pennock | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Thomas Horan | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leo Skyner | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hakeem Olayinka Babalola | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
claire goudsmit | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
james sinclair taylor | Trustee | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.55m | £13.98m | £14.19m | £22.28m | £26.15m | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.75m | £11.46m | £11.66m | £17.56m | £23.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £257.51k | £1.28k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £11.90m | £13.64m | £13.98m | £21.77m | £25.07m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £114.00k | £162.00k | £202.00k | £205.00k | £164.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £386.00k | £133.00k | £0 | £269.00k | £494.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £25.00k | £9.00k | £2.00k | £37.00k | £423.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £132.00k | £29.00k | £8.00k | £1.00k | £6.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.12m | £1.42m | £1.31m | £1.95m | £1.70m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £8.93m | £8.34m | £8.09m | £14.00m | £19.21m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.81m | £3.12m | £3.57m | £3.56m | £3.86m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £17.00k | £27.00k | £32.00k | £32.00k | £32.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.70m | £644.00k | £1.18m | £4.14m | £5.82m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £381.00k | £241.00k | £166.00k | £155.00k | £13.13m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £10.98m | £14.25m | £17.08m | £20.64m | £12.35m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £940.00k | £1.55m | £1.78m | £604.00k | £2.08m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 DEC 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 APR 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 DEC 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 MAR 2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 MAR 2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 JUN 2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 JUN 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 SEP 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 SEP 2020 as amended on 04 Mar 2024 as amended on 28 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROVIDE ON A WORLDWIDE BASIS HUMANITARIAN RELIEF, AID AND ASSISTANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN CHARITABLE NEED AFFECTED BY, OR VULNERABLE TO, DISASTER OR OTHER EVENTS, PARTICULARLY BY PROVIDING SHELTER
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Shelterbox Trust
Falcon House
Charles Street
TRURO
TR1 2PH
- Phone:
- 01872302600
- Email:
- hello@shelterbox.org
- Website:
-
shelterbox.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window