Financial history SIGHTLINE VISION (NORTH WEST) LIMITED

Charity Number: 1096452
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £28.03k £79.16k £89.44k £66.39k £92.85k
Total expenditure £46.34k £68.07k £81.76k £82.97k £86.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £91.79k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A