Accounts and annual returns NORTHFIELDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1121056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 June 2023 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 June 2023 507 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 February 2023 737 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 February 2023 737 days late Download Open in new window