Financial history NORTHFIELDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1121056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £27.37k £7.37k £16.23k £23.66k £23.35k
Total expenditure £24.24k £20.73k £22.76k £23.44k £23.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A