CHRISTIANS AGAINST POVERTY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christians Against Poverty provides free professional debt help, money education and support groups to members of the public. Services are delivered face-to-face in partnership with local churches, allowing us to provide both practical and emotional support to our clients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£19,161,835
Donations and legacies | £18.17m | |
Charitable activities | £300.58k | |
Other trading activities | £66.72k | |
Investments | £5.56k | |
Other | £620.42k |
Total expenditure:
£20,015,382
Raising funds | £1.64m | |
Charitable activities | £18.23m | |
Other | £144.23k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £620,425 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.78m | |
Charitable expenditure | £18.23m |
People

376 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 April 2003: Standard registration
- 01 March 2017: Funds received from 1076566 STAMFORD HOUSING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE (SHYP)
- 12 November 2018: Funds received from 1113980 LIFE-GIVING CHURCH
- 07 June 2022: Funds received from 1075100 RHEMA CHURCH LONDON
- 10 July 2023: Funds received from 1155031 MERTON VINEYARD CHURCH
- 14 July 2023: Funds received from 1174250 ARK ASSIST (NORTH WEST)
- 11 October 2023: Funds received from 1178711 NORTH SHIELDS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
- 01 February 2024: Funds received from 515572 JEZREEL NEW TESTAMENT CHURCH
- 01 February 2024: Funds received from 289340 THE ENFIELD TOWN AND FORTY HILL CHURCHES JOINT TRU...
- 27 February 2024: Funds received from 1091791 THE KING'S CHURCH, POOLE
- 10 September 2024: Funds received from 1204112 BLESSINGS TRUST
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger David Hattam | Chair | 30 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew James Maskell | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Olufemi Ayolomo Ishola | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
MARK ROBERT SHEARD | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|||||||
Sandra Jane Keene | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|||||||
Folajimi Ayodele Adedoyin | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|||||||
Roger Mawle | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Catherine Nicholas-Vilkaitis | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
ROBIN BRYAN DAVID WILLISON | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Kathleen Elizabeth Pleace | Trustee | 30 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.37m | £15.36m | £15.18m | £14.96m | £19.16m | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.66m | £14.25m | £14.74m | £17.24m | £20.02m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £405.00k | £1.20m | £1.36m | £620.42k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £13.62m | £14.33m | £13.38m | £13.10m | £18.17m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £92.00k | £98.00k | £118.14k | £56.09k | £66.72k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £655.00k | £541.00k | £467.63k | £430.78k | £300.58k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.00k | £2.00k | £980 | £1.14k | £5.56k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £394.00k | £1.21m | £1.36m | £620.42k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £42.00k | £137.00k | £173.24k | £151.38k | £155.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £12.40m | £11.54m | £13.19m | £15.30m | £18.23m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.22m | £1.31m | £1.51m | £1.81m | £1.64m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £67.00k | £46.00k | £62.21k | £66.21k | £83.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £36.00k | £1.39m | £41.40k | £127.93k | £144.23k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.61m | £2.17m | £5.01m | £6.03m | £5.79m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £3.59m | £5.91m | £5.58m | £2.04m | £1.88m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.31m | £1.07m | £2.46m | £2.22m | £2.68m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 3RD FEBRUARY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 5 FEBRUARY 2007, AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION 10 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR PERSONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES BY PROVIDING AND PROMOTING THE PROVISIONS OF ADVICE AND OTHER SERVICES AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE MANAGEMENT OF THEIR PERSONAL FINANCES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND DOCTRINE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christians Against Poverty
Jubilee House
1 Filey Street
BRADFORD
West Yorkshire
BD1 5LQ
- Phone:
- 01274760720
- Email:
- info@capuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window