Financial history NORTH WALES SCIENCE

Charity Number: 1102959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £790.94k £824.04k £927.44k £940.82k £1.88m
Total expenditure £801.43k £825.88k £903.76k £927.36k £1.24m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £355.78k £227.30k £276.13k £319.64k £178.33k
Income - Donations and legacies £194.71k £66.93k £68.54k £98.12k £95.91k
Income - Other trading activities £18.40k £12.69k £77.31k £67.35k £0
Income - Charitable activities £471.18k £541.92k £679.84k £623.20k £983.97k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £106.66k £202.50k £101.75k £152.14k £799.69k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £787.62k £815.17k £847.42k £847.15k £1.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £13.81k £10.71k £56.34k £80.22k £98.54k
Expenditure - Governance £13.61k £8.68k £9.78k £18.86k £14.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0