RELATE BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Adult Relationship Counselling for couples and individuals, Counselling for Young People (Talktime), Family Counselling, Psychosexual Therapy, Life Skills Training, Education and Workshops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Luton
Governance
- 25 March 2003: Standard registration
- 29 January 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 29 January 2021: Funds transferred to 207314 R NATIONAL REALISATIONS (2024)
- RELATE BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON (Working name)
- RELATE BEDFORD (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £330.87k | £324.68k | £304.82k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £304.80k | £301.16k | £297.26k | £194.85k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £144.00k | £41.85k | £81.11k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 06 March 2020 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 04 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 04 October 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 29 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 29 January 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/02/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/09/2003 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10/09/2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11/07/2014 as amended on 26 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
(I) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL, SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS; (2)TO SEEK TO ENHANCE, THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY;- INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE; AND WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF SUCH RELATIONSHIPS. (3) TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING, ADVICE, EDUCATION AND GUIDANCE AND RELIEF TO ADULTS AND/OR CHILDREN IN RELATION TO ANY ASPECT OF CONTEMPORARY LIFE OR WORK WHICH: MAY PREJUDICE THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL WELL BEING; OR INFLUENCE, EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, THEIR PRESENT OR FUTURE FAMILY OR COUPLE RELATIONSHIP; (4) TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND (5) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window