BORROWBROOK HOME LINK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping older people in the parish of Borrowash and Ockbrook, Derbyshire, to live independent lives thereby increasing their confidence and self-esteem and reducing isolation and social exclusion and improving relationships across the community and ensuring that they are better informed about their physical and mental health, welfare benefits and wider social opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £12,120 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 27 June 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT LEWIS NORTON | Chair |
|
||||||
Anthony John Beenham | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Alexander | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE ELAINE BULMAN | Trustee | 09 February 2017 |
|
|||||
JANET DOROTHY PINCHBECK | Trustee | 07 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ANDREW LOW ALEXANDER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.82k | £14.30k | £24.32k | £19.81k | £23.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.59k | £17.70k | £18.36k | £24.30k | £18.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.90k | £2.80k | £2.80k | £2.80k | £12.12k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED 20 MAY 2003 AMENDED BY A SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 24 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER, WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN AND AROUND THE PARISH OF BORROWASH AND OCKBROOK
Area of benefit
IN AND AROUND THE PARISH OF BORROWASH AND OKCBROOK
Contact information
- Address:
-
1A Chapel Row
Borrowash
Derby
DERBYSHIRE
DE72 3LR
- Phone:
- 01332 280111
- Email:
- borrowbrook@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window