Financial history WILLIAM LEVICK SCHOOL PTFA

Charity Number: 1102989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £3.85k £1.56k £6.33k £6.66k £7.60k
Total expenditure £5.34k £1.44k £2.03k £3.19k £5.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A