THE FURNITURE STATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Furniture Station aims to help disadvantaged people in Stockport by providing them with good quality re-used furniture. Many people cannot afford to buy the items they need to make a house into a home. All clients are referred by local organisations. The project also ensures many items, which would otherwise end up in landfill, continue to have a useful life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2018
Total income includes £11,781 from government contract(s) and £9,905 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Manchester City
- Stockport
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 30/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.73k | £167.07k | £141.91k | £134.32k | £129.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.40k | £172.29k | £170.75k | £148.20k | £195.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £17.04k | £19.41k | £11.78k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £18.75k | £10.81k | £9.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 23 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 23 October 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 28 July 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 28 July 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 01 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 01 September 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 27 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 27 August 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING RECYCLED FURNITURE HOUSEHOLD ITEMS AND EQUIPMENT AND CLOTHING TO PERSONS IN NEED AND 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND REHABILITATION BY PROVIDING WORK-RELATED TRAINING IN THE REPAIR OF FURNITURE AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS AND EQUIPMENT.
Area of benefit
STOCKPORT, MACCLESFIELD, CHESHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window